Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria Alcaráz y Alenda

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1877Born
21 Jul 190124.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 193052.8AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
20 Jul 193053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
22 Jul 197194.2DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Maria Alcaráz y Alenda
Bishop José Maria Alcaráz y Alenda (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAspe

  • a priest for 70.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast