Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Irurita y Almándoz

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1876Born
1901²24.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 192650.3AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
25 Mar 192750.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
13 Mar 193053.5AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
3 Dec 193660.2DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Irurita y Almándoz
Bishop Manuel Irurita y Almándoz (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarráinzar

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast