Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tedde

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1906BornSorso
8 Sep 192923.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 194841.4AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
25 Apr 194841.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
6 Aug 198275.9DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tedde:
Bishop Antonio Tedde (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015