Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Ghiga

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1902Born
7 Nov 192624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Iglesias, Italy
10 Feb 196158.5AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
25 Apr 196158.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
31 Mar 196360.6DiedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Ghiga
Bishop Mario Ghiga (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbasco d'Alba

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,962
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,964
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast