Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pirastru

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

Titular Bishop of Trebia Augusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1883BornPloaghe
31 Dec 190522.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 193047.2AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
7 Sep 193047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
7 Sep 197087.3RetiredBishop of Iglesias, Italy
7 Sep 197087.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trebia Augusta
31 Mar 197894.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pirastru:
Bishop Giovanni Pirastru (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iglesias

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013