Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Melis Fois

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nuoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1916BornSorgono
13 Aug 193922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oristano, Italy
25 May 196346.6AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
28 Jul 196346.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
7 Nov 197054.1AppointedBishop of Nuoro, Italy
16 Apr 199275.5RetiredBishop of Nuoro, Italy
3 Sep 200992.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nuoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Melis Fois:
Bishop Giovanni Melis Fois (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nuoro

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013