Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfranco Girotti, O.F.M. Conv.

Regent Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Titular Bishop of Meta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1937 Born
17 Feb 196325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Feb 200264.8AppointedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary
15 Nov 200669.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Meta
16 Dec 200669.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meta
26 Jun 201275.1RetiredRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco Girotti
Bishop Gianfranco Girotti O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Regent Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Penitentiary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,297
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018