Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardito Cleopas Auza

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain

Titular Archbishop of Suacia

Apostolic Nuncio to Andorra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1959 Born
29 Jun 198526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Talibon, Philippines
8 May 200848.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Suacia
8 May 200848.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
3 Jul 200849.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Suacia
1 Jul 201455.0AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations
1 Oct 201960.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Oct 201960.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Andorra

MicroData Summary for Bernardito Cleopas Auza
Archbishop Bernardito Cleopas Auza (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalibon, Philippines
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Spain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,774
  • ab: CB, 1 Jul 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast