Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose Madtha

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire

Titular Archbishop of Naissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1955Born
28 Mar 198226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lucknow, India
8 May 200852.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
8 May 200852.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naissus
27 Jul 200852.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naissus
8 Dec 201257.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Madtha
Archbishop Ambrose Madtha (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Côte d’Ivoire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelthangady, India
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Lucknow, Diocese of Lucknow, India
Death Place

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,938
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast