Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Mennini

Official of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Ferentium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1947 Born
14 Dec 197427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
8 Jul 200052.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ferentium
8 Jul 200052.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
12 Sep 200053.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ferentium
6 Nov 200255.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
26 Jul 200860.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uzbekistan
18 Dec 201063.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
6 Feb 201769.4AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mennini (VIAF: 90277243)
Archbishop Antonio Mennini (born ) Official of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,836
  • ab: CL, 20 Jan 2017
  • ab: CB, 22 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017