Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Antônio Tavoni

Bishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1967 Born
30 Nov 199629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
15 Jan 201446.7AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil
1 Mar 201446.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil
28 Mar 201446.9InstalledBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcos Antônio Tavoni
Bishop Marcos Antônio Tavoni (born ) Bishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Carlos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2014
  • c1: CB, 15 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • c2+/i: CB, 26 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018