Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip E. R. Dickmans

Bishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1963 Born
4 Apr 199027.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hasselt, Belgium
30 Sep 199027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hasselt, Belgium
21 May 200845.3AppointedBishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil
15 Aug 200845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Miracema do Tocantins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Philip E. R. Dickmans
Bishop Philip E. R. Dickmans (born ) Bishop of Miracema do Tocantins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHerk-de-Stad, Belgium

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miracema do Tocantins.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast