Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdo Matias Kujawski

Bishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1947 BornPoznań, Poland
24 May 197326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
2 Jul 200861.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
15 Aug 200861.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
4 Nov 200962.8SucceededBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Romualdo Matias Kujawski:
Bishop Romualdo Matias Kujawski (born ) Bishop of Porto Nacional

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto Nacional.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,947
  • s: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013