Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Zon Pereira, S.X.

Bishop of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1956 Born
2 Oct 198226.6ProfessedMember of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
21 Jun 198630.4Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
27 Aug 201458.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
8 Nov 201458.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
20 May 201559.3SucceededBishop of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Zon Pereira
Bishop Adolfo Zon Pereira S.X. (born ) Bishop of Alto Solimões

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrense, Diocese of Orense, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alto Solimões.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2014
  • ob: CB, 27 Aug 2014
  • c2+: CB, 24 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,318
  • s: Bollettino, 20 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast