Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Vieira Gusmão

Bishop Emeritus of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1934 Born
3 Dec 196127.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 199763.1AppointedBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
19 Mar 199863.4Ordained BishopBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
4 Nov 200975.0RetiredBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Vieira Gusmão
Bishop Geraldo Vieira Gusmão (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto Nacional

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItamarandiba
Ordained BishopGinásio Poliesportivo, Curvelo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Porto Nacional.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,254
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast