Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de Assis Ribeiro, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Babra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1966 Born
10 Jan 198720.4ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Jun 199528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Jun 201750.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
28 Jun 201750.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Babra
2 Sep 201751.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Babra

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Assis Ribeiro
Bishop Antônio de Assis Ribeiro S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOurém, Territorial Prelature of Guamá, Para
Ordained BishopIn front of Matriz Nossa Senhora da Conceição, Chapel, Ourém, Diocese of Bragança do Pará

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Belém do Pará.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Sep 2017