Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evaristo Pascoal Spengler, O.F.M.

Prelate of Marajó, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1959 BornGaspar
2 Aug 198223.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Nov 198223.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
19 May 198425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Jun 201657.1AppointedPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
6 Aug 201657.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
27 Aug 201657.4InstalledPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Evaristo Pascoal Spengler
Bishop Evaristo Pascoal Spengler O.F.M. (born ) Prelate of Marajó

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Marajó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 22 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016