Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Mendes Tavares, C.S.Sp.

Coadjutor Bishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1964 BornSão Miguel Arcanjo – Ilha de Santiago
8 Sep 198622.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
11 Jul 199329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Feb 201147.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
16 Feb 201147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Verbe
8 May 201147.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verbe
10 Jun 201551.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Mendes Tavares:
Bishop Teodoro Mendes Tavares C.S.Sp. (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Ponta de Pedras

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ponta de Pedras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,054
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015