Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital Corbellini

Bishop of Marabá, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1959 BornGaribaldi
28 Dec 198627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Oct 201252.8AppointedBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
30 Nov 201252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
21 Dec 201253.0InstalledBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vital Corbellini:
Bishop Vital Corbellini (born ) Bishop of Marabá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marabá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 11 Oct 2012
  • c2+: CB, 31 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,609

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015