Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Zielski

Bishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1947 BornBrodnica
21 May 197225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pelplin, Poland
2 Feb 200052.9AppointedBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
7 May 200053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
2 Mar 201669.0AppointedBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
2 Apr 201669.1InstalledBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Zielski
Bishop Eduardo Zielski (born ) Bishop of São Raimundo Nonato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Raimundo Nonato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,756
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2016
  • i: CB, 9 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016