Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elio Rama, I.M.C.

Bishop of Pinheiro, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1953 BornTucunduva
21 Oct 198229.0ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
10 Nov 198431.0Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
17 Oct 201259.0AppointedBishop of Pinheiro, Maranho, Brazil
30 Dec 201259.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pinheiro, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Elio Rama:
Bishop Elio Rama I.M.C. (born ) Bishop of Pinheiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinheiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 25 Oct 2012
  • c2: CB, 13 Nov 2012
  • c34: CB, 26 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,619

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013