Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Chiarlo

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1881BornPontremoli, Italy
28 May 190422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
12 Oct 192846.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
12 Oct 192846.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
11 Nov 192847.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida
28 Jan 193250.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Costa Rica
28 Jan 193250.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Nicaragua
28 Jan 193250.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Panama
28 Jan 193250.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Honduras
28 Jan 193250.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to El Salvador
28 Jan 193250.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guatemala
30 Sep 193351.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
30 Sep 193351.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
30 Sep 193351.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
30 Sep 193351.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Honduras
30 Sep 193351.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to El Salvador
30 Sep 193351.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Guatemala
1940¹58.2AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
19 Mar 194664.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
1 Sep 195472.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
15 Dec 195877.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195877.1RetiredOfficial of the Secretariat of State
18 Dec 195877.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
21 Jan 196482.2DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Chiarlo:
Cardinal Carlo Chiarlo (born , died ) Official Emeritus of State

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 77
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013