Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ilson de Jesus Montanari

Secretary of the Congregation for Bishops

Titular Archbishop of Caput Cilla

Secretary of the College of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1959 BornSertãozinho, Brazil
18 Aug 198930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Oct 201354.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
12 Oct 201354.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caput Cilla
7 Nov 201354.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caput Cilla
28 Jan 201454.5AppointedSecretary of the College of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Ilson de Jesus Montanari:
Archbishop Ilson de Jesus Montanari (born ) Secretary of Bishops

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for Bishops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 21 Oct 2013
  • c2+: CB, 23 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 148
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,981
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014