Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John James Joseph Monaghan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1856Born
18 Dec 188024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
26 Jan 189740.6AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
9 May 189740.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
10 Jul 192569.1ResignedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
10 Jul 192569.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
7 Jan 193578.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for John James Joseph Monaghan
Bishop John James Joseph Monaghan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSumter, SC, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Pro-Cathedral, Wilmington, Diocese of Wilmington, Delaware

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 599
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast