Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico del Buono

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1880BornBari
1905²24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
29 May 192039.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
29 May 192039.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augile
27 Jun 192039.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augile
24 Jul 192544.9AppointedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
16 Jan 192948.4DiedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico del Buono:
Bishop Domenico del Buono (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto

  • a priest for 24.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1920, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013