Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Vizzini

Deceased

Bishop of Noto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1874BornVillalba
1897²22.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 191338.8AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
14 Sep 191338.8Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
8 Dec 193561.1DiedBishop of Noto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vizzini:
Bishop Giuseppe Vizzini (born , died ) Bishop of Noto

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013