Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Lauri

Deceased

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1864Born
4 Jun 188722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
4 Jan 191651.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
5 Jan 191752.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
8 Jan 191752.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Peru
21 Jan 191752.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
20 Jul 191752.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
25 May 192156.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 Dec 192662.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 192662.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
23 Jun 192762.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
31 Jul 192762.7AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
11 Dec 193975.1AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
8 Oct 194176.9DiedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Lauri
Lorenzo Cardinal Lauri (born , died ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 3
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 205, and Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast