Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Joseph McCarthy

Deceased

Archbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1850BornHalifax
9 Jul 187424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 Jun 190656.4AppointedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
9 Sep 190656.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
26 Jan 193181.0DiedArchbishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph McCarthy:
Archbishop Edward Joseph McCarthy (born , died ) Archbishop of Halifax

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1906, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015