Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Peter Franziskus Ross, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hiroshima, Japan

Titular Bishop of Tabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1875Born
28 Aug 190933.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 May 192852.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hiroshima, Japan
18 May 192852.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabala
5 Aug 192852.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabala
20 Nov 194064.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Hiroshima, Japan
26 Dec 196994.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hiroshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Johannes Peter Franziskus Ross
Bishop Johannes Peter Franziskus Ross S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hiroshima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAachen, Germany

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast