Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nagasaki

Archidioecesis Nagasakiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Mitsuaki Takami, P.S.S., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 May 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 4,192 (1,619 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.nagasaki.catholic.jp/
  • Mailing Address: 10-34 Uenomachi, 852-8113, Japan
  • Telephone: (095)846-4246
  • Fax: 848-8310

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan
22 May 1876ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Japan Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan (erected)
20 March 1888Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan Vicariate Apostolic of Central Japan (erected)
Diocese of Nagasaki
15 June 1891ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Japan
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Japan
Diocese of Nagasaki
18 March 1927Territory LostDiocese of Nagasaki Prefecture Apostolic of Kagoshima (erected)
16 July 1927Territory LostDiocese of Nagasaki Diocese of Fukuoka (erected)
Archdiocese of Nagasaki
4 May 1959ElevatedDiocese of Nagasaki Archdiocese of Nagasaki

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nagasaki
195063,1701,651,5583.8%3911501,263279536ap1951
Archdiocese of Nagasaki
197070,2921,600,0134.4%77391166056835263ap1971
198074,7841,590,2924.7%76441206237477465ap1981
199072,3291,575,2224.6%835814151218286469ap1991
199969,2241,531,9904.5%914613750519788972ap2000
200069,0251,527,1384.5%9256148466110887972ap2001
200168,8011,516,8724.5%92511434819786972ap2002
200268,5511,511,8904.5%975515245018586372ap2003
200368,4621,506,5114.5%965114746518184772ap2004
200467,7281,500,2494.5%974514247617284972ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Aug 2014