Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmond Heelan

Deceased

Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1868BornKnockaney, Ireland
24 Jun 189022.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 191850.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
21 Dec 191850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
8 Apr 191951.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
8 Mar 192052.1AppointedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
20 Sep 194880.6DiedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmond Heelan:
Bishop Edmond Heelan (born , died ) Bishop of Sioux City

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013