Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Boylan

Deceased

Bishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1889Born
28 Jul 191525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
21 Nov 194253.1AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
17 Feb 194353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
24 Feb 194353.3InstalledBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
19 Jul 195363.7DiedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Boylan
Bishop John Joseph Boylan (born , died ) Bishop of Rockford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY
Ordained PriestProvidence, RI

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/i/d: Website of the Diocese, 4 Dec 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,943, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast