Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Aloysius Fitzgerald

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1893BornCresco, IA
25 Jul 191623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
3 Aug 194653.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
3 Aug 194653.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cantanus
12 Sep 194653.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cantanus
20 Oct 194956.7AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
8 Jan 196975.9RetiredBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
8 Jan 196975.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zerta
31 Dec 197077.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Zerta
31 Mar 197279.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Aloysius Fitzgerald:
Bishop Edward Aloysius Fitzgerald (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Winona

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013