Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Blouet de Camilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1664Born
1 May 170439.9SelectedBishop of Toul, France
7 Sep 170541.2ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
22 Nov 170541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
13 Dec 170541.5InstalledBishop of Toul, France
9 Jan 172156.6SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
20 Jan 172358.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
17 Oct 172359.4DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for François Blouet de Camilly
Archbishop François Blouet de Camilly (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast