Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri-Osvald Cardinal de La Tour d’Auvergne de Bouillon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1671BornBarcy
11 Jan 172149.2SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
23 Mar 172250.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
10 May 172250.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vienne, France
20 Aug 172250.8InstalledArchbishop of Vienne, France
20 Dec 173766.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 174068.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
3 Jul 174573.7ResignedArchbishop of Vienne, France
23 Apr 174775.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vienne, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Osvald de La Tour d’Auvergne de Bouillon:
Cardinal Henri-Osvald de La Tour d’Auvergne de Bouillon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013