Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Alphonse de Valbelle de Tourves

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1686BornAix en Provence
25 Sep 172134.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Omer, France
6 Jul 172235.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Omer, France
6 Jul 172235.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
11 Apr 172336.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
17 Nov 172740.9SucceededBishop of Saint-Omer, France
13 Jun 175467.5DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Alphonse de Valbelle de Tourves:
Bishop Joseph-Alphonse de Valbelle de Tourves (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015