Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Annet de Clermont de Chaste de Roussillon

Deceased

Bishop of Laon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1662BornCharpey
24 Dec 169432.6SelectedBishop of Laon, France
19 Sep 169533.4ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
6 Nov 169533.5Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
5 Oct 172159.4DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Annet de Clermont de Chaste de Roussillon:
Bishop Louis-Annet de Clermont de Chaste de Roussillon (born , died ) Bishop of Laon

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015