Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kálmán József Papp

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1886Born
29 Jun 190822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
3 May 194660.1AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
16 Jun 194660.3Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
28 Jul 196680.4DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Kálmán József Papp
Bishop Kálmán József Papp (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSopron

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast