Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Robert Roach

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1921Born
8 Jun 194624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
12 Jul 197149.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
12 Jul 197149.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
8 Sep 197150.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
21 May 197553.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
8 Sep 199574.1RetiredArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
11 Jul 200381.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Robert Roach
(VIAF: 55791986; WikiData: Q6255036)
Archbishop John Robert Roach (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrior Lake, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained PriestSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Death PlaceSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 811
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 21 Feb 2024