Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerome George Hanus, O.S.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1940 BornBrainard, NE
1 Sep 196121.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Jul 196626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Jul 198747.1AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
24 Aug 198747.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
23 Aug 199454.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
27 Oct 199454.4InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
16 Oct 199555.3SucceededArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
8 Apr 201372.8ResignedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome George Hanus:
Archbishop Jerome George Hanus O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dubuque.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015