Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Henry Bullock

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1927Born
7 Jun 195225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
3 Jun 198053.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
3 Jun 198053.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Natchesium
12 Aug 198053.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Natchesium
10 Feb 198759.8AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
2 Apr 198759.9InstalledBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
13 Apr 199366.0AppointedBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
14 Jun 199366.1InstalledBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
23 May 200376.1RetiredBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
3 Apr 201183.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for William Henry Bullock
Bishop William Henry Bullock (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Madison

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaple Lake

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018