Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Herman Balke

Bishop Emeritus of Crookston, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1931 BornMeppen
24 May 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Illinois, USA
7 Jul 197644.8AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
2 Sep 197644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
28 Sep 200776.0RetiredBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Victor Herman Balke:
Bishop Victor Herman Balke (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Crookston

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Crookston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013