Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Henry Brom

Bishop Emeritus of San Diego, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1938 Born
18 Dec 196325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Winona, Minnesota, USA
25 Mar 198344.5AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
23 May 198344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
22 Apr 198950.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Diego, California, USA
10 Jul 199051.8SucceededBishop of San Diego, California, USA
18 Sep 201375.0RetiredBishop of San Diego, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Henry Brom
Bishop Robert Henry Brom (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcadia, WI

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Diego.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017