Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Leo Charron, C.Pp.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Des Moines, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1939 Born
15 Aug 196525.6ProfessedMember of Society of Precious Blood
3 Jun 196727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
6 Nov 198949.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
6 Nov 198949.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
25 Jan 199050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
12 Nov 199353.8AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
10 Apr 200767.2ResignedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Leo Charron
Bishop Joseph Leo Charron C.Pp.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Des Moines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRedfield, SD

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Des Moines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,688

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018