Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto César Alves Ferreira da Silva, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1932 Born
24 Jul 196028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
19 Feb 197239.9AppointedBishop of Tete, Mozambique
21 May 197240.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tete, Mozambique
31 May 197644.2ResignedBishop of Tete, Mozambique
25 Sep 197846.5AppointedBishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal
22 Apr 200472.1ResignedBishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Augusto César Alves Ferreira da Silva
Bishop Augusto César Alves Ferreira da Silva C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Portalegre-Castelo Branco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFervença-Celorico de Basto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portalegre-Castelo Branco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast