Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Ramos Monteiro, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1928Born
11 Dec 194921.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Apr 195122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Aug 198758.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Viseu, Portugal
11 Oct 198759.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Viseu, Portugal
14 Sep 198859.9SucceededBishop of Viseu, Portugal
3 Apr 200475.4DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Ramos Monteiro
Bishop António Ramos Monteiro O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFafe

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,418
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast