Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Januário Torgal Mendes Ferreira

Bishop Emeritus of Portugal, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1938 BornPorto
15 Oct 196022.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 198951.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portugal, Military
22 Apr 198951.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
15 Jul 198951.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
3 May 200163.2AppointedBishop of Portugal, Military
10 Oct 201375.6RetiredBishop of Portugal, Military

MicroData Summary for Januário Torgal Mendes Ferreira:
Bishop Januário Torgal Mendes Ferreira (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Portugal, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Portugal, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,181
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Oct 2013