Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Francisco Marques, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santarém, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1927Born
20 Jul 195225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Jul 197548.0AppointedBishop of Santarém, Portugal
4 Oct 197548.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santarém, Portugal
28 Aug 199770.2DiedBishop of Santarém, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Francisco Marques
Bishop António Francisco Marques O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santarém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldelas-Caranguejeira

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast