Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Valmor César Teixeira, S.D.B.

Bishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1953 BornRio do Sul
31 Jan 197117.9ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Dec 197926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Jan 200955.9AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
29 Mar 200956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
18 Apr 200956.1InstalledBishop of Bom Jesus da Lapa, Bahia, Brazil
20 Mar 201461.1AppointedBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 May 201461.2InstalledBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Valmor César Teixeira:
Bishop José Valmor César Teixeira S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of São José dos Campos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São José dos Campos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,086
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 30 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014