Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Niehues

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1914Born
16 Apr 193823.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 195944.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
8 Jan 195944.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
5 Apr 195944.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
3 Aug 196550.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
3 Aug 196550.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aptuca
18 May 196752.7SucceededArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
23 Jan 199176.4RetiredArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
30 Sep 199379.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Niehues
Archbishop Alfonso Niehues (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Florianópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Ludgero

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1993, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017